THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:09:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-4530
Fax: (905) 813-4548
Address: 3545 Odyssey Drive
West GTA Endoscopy
unit 18
Mississauga Ontario L5M 7N4
Phone: 9058230223
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1815 Melody Dr
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2K9
Phone: 647-234-9475
Fax: No Information Available
Address: A-1276 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 7W5
Phone: 905 849 8646
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Humniski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Humniski (CPSO#: 70409 )
Business Address: The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
ER Department
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4141
Business Address: 1815 Melody Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2K9
(647) 234-9475

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-4530
Fax: (905) 813-4548
Address: 3545 Odyssey Drive
West GTA Endoscopy
unit 18
Mississauga Ontario L5M 7N4
Phone: 9058230223
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1815 Melody Dr
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2K9
Phone: 647-234-9475
Fax: No Information Available
Address: A-1276 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 7W5
Phone: 905 849 8646
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Humniski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Humniski (CPSO#: 70409 )
Business Address: The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
ER Department
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4141
Business Address: 1815 Melody Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2K9
(647) 234-9475

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE-MARIE PAULA HUMNISKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMNISKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE-MARIE PAULA HUMNISKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMNISKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996