THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:41:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Scarborough Hospital - ED
3050 Lawrence Ave. E.
Toronto, ON
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 438 2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 07 Sep 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Hodge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hodge (CPSO#: 70425 )
Business Address: 285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2M 2G1
(416) 226-6780
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 5N3
(519) 376-2121
Business Address: 725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 2Y6
(705) 753-3110
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Scarborough Hospital - ED
3050 Lawrence Ave. E.
Toronto, ON
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 438 2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 07 Sep 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Public Health and Preventive Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Hodge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hodge (CPSO#: 70425 )
Business Address: 285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2M 2G1
(416) 226-6780
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 5N3
(519) 376-2121
Business Address: 725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 2Y6
(705) 753-3110
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JOHN HODGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JOHN HODGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996