THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 05:30:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Towne Centre Medical Clinic
Suite 201
3601 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3R 0M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 604-3336
Fax: (905) 604-7750

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nayana A. Suchak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Suchak (CPSO#: 70429 )
Business Address: Towne Centre Medical Clinic
201 - 3601 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3R 0M3
(905) 604-3336
Business Address: 60 Murray Street
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Towne Centre Medical Clinic
Suite 201
3601 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3R 0M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 604-3336
Fax: (905) 604-7750

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nayana A. Suchak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Suchak (CPSO#: 70429 )
Business Address: Towne Centre Medical Clinic
201 - 3601 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3R 0M3
(905) 604-3336
Business Address: 60 Murray Street
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAYANA AVINASH SUCHAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUCHAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAYANA AVINASH SUCHAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUCHAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996