THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:29:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Josephs Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street 2nd Floor
London, Ontario
N6A 4V2
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6383
Fax: (519) 646-6173
Address: 444 Waterloo Street
London Ontario N6B 2P2
Phone: (519) 433-8500
Fax: (519) 433-8599

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Corey Curtis Moore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Moore (CPSO#: 70430 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Hospital
Suite B2-501
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6383
Business Address: Woodfield Surgical Centre
444 Waterloo Street
London Ontario N6B 2P2
(519) 433-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Josephs Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street 2nd Floor
London, Ontario
N6A 4V2
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6383
Fax: (519) 646-6173
Address: 444 Waterloo Street
London Ontario N6B 2P2
Phone: (519) 433-8500
Fax: (519) 433-8599

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Corey Curtis Moore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Moore (CPSO#: 70430 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Hospital
Suite B2-501
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6383
Business Address: Woodfield Surgical Centre
444 Waterloo Street
London Ontario N6B 2P2
(519) 433-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COREY CURTIS MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COREY CURTIS MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996