THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:59:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 847 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 3B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 544-5255
Fax: (905) 544-5155
Address: 10520 Yonge Street
Unit 4B
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3C7
Phone: (905) 787-8999
Fax: (905) 787-8933
Address: 9 Progress Ave
Unit 1A
Scarborough Ontario M1P 5A4
Phone: 6473506662
Fax: 6473496662

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael G. Nelson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nelson (CPSO#: 70482 )
Business Address: Suite 1A
9 Progress Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1P 5A4
Business Address: Suite 4B
10520 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3C7
Business Address: 847 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 3B4
(905) 544-5255

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 847 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 3B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 544-5255
Fax: (905) 544-5155
Address: 10520 Yonge Street
Unit 4B
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3C7
Phone: (905) 787-8999
Fax: (905) 787-8933
Address: 9 Progress Ave
Unit 1A
Scarborough Ontario M1P 5A4
Phone: 6473506662
Fax: 6473496662

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael G. Nelson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nelson (CPSO#: 70482 )
Business Address: Suite 1A
9 Progress Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1P 5A4
Business Address: Suite 4B
10520 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3C7
Business Address: 847 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 3B4
(905) 544-5255

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GREGGOR NELSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NELSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GREGGOR NELSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NELSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996