THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:26:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 218-4190 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON M1S 4T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164977277
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kapur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kapur (CPSO#: 70507 ) Dr. A. Kapur (CPSO#: 62540 )
Business Address: 3276 St Clair Ave E
Providence HealthCare
Bariatric Assessment Centre
Scarborough ON M1L 1W1
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6084
Business Address: 218-4190 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON M1S 4T7
4164977277

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 218-4190 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON M1S 4T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164977277
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kapur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kapur (CPSO#: 70507 ) Dr. A. Kapur (CPSO#: 62540 )
Business Address: 3276 St Clair Ave E
Providence HealthCare
Bariatric Assessment Centre
Scarborough ON M1L 1W1
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6084
Business Address: 218-4190 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON M1S 4T7
4164977277

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NISHTHA KAPUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NISHTHA KAPUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bombay, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996