THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 05:08:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, KONKANI, MARATHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 29 Noxon St
Ingersoll ON N5C 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 485 1700
Extension: 8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Pain Clinic
Alexandra Hospital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 3V6
Phone: (519) 485-9611
Fax: (519) 485-9601
Address: 202-215 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 5A9
Phone: 519 601 7171
Fax: 519 601 7174

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kamath (CPSO#: 70508 )
Business Address: Suite 203
450 Central Avenue
London Ontario N6B 2E8
(519) 432-7350
Business Address: 75 Compton Cres
London ON N6C 4E9
5196944830

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, KONKANI, MARATHI
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 29 Noxon St
Ingersoll ON N5C 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 485 1700
Extension: 8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Pain Clinic
Alexandra Hospital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 3V6
Phone: (519) 485-9611
Fax: (519) 485-9601
Address: 202-215 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 5A9
Phone: 519 601 7171
Fax: 519 601 7174

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kamath (CPSO#: 70508 )
Business Address: Suite 203
450 Central Avenue
London Ontario N6B 2E8
(519) 432-7350
Business Address: 75 Compton Cres
London ON N6C 4E9
5196944830

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VRANDA SURESH KAMATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMATH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VRANDA SURESH KAMATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMATH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bombay, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996