THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:55:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Hospital
12th Floor
620 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Fax: (416) 946-2866

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Camilla Zimmermann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Zimmermann (CPSO#: 70518 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Suite 16-712
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4611

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Hospital
12th Floor
620 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Fax: (416) 946-2866

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Camilla Zimmermann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Zimmermann (CPSO#: 70518 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Suite 16-712
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4611

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMILLA CORA ULRICA ZIMMERMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIMMERMANN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMILLA CORA ULRICA ZIMMERMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIMMERMANN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996