THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 03:44:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Phillbrook Medical Clinic
1599 Adelaide Street N, Unit 105
London,ON
London Ontario N5X4E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)433-2891
Fax: (519)433-7865
Address: 1866 Oxford Street West
London Ontario N6K 0J8
Phone: 5196571919
Fax: 5194728017

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine Cramer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cramer (CPSO#: 70565 )
Business Address: 105-1599 Adelaide St N
London ON N5X 4E8
5194332891

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Phillbrook Medical Clinic
1599 Adelaide Street N, Unit 105
London,ON
London Ontario N5X4E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)433-2891
Fax: (519)433-7865
Address: 1866 Oxford Street West
London Ontario N6K 0J8
Phone: 5196571919
Fax: 5194728017

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine Cramer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cramer (CPSO#: 70565 )
Business Address: 105-1599 Adelaide St N
London ON N5X 4E8
5194332891

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ROBERTA CRAMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAMER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ROBERTA CRAMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAMER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1996