THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:30:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 Queensway W.
Mississauga Ontario L5B1B5
Phone: 905-270-0170
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 26 Peter St N.
Mississauga Ontario L5H 2G7
Phone: 905-278-2213
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lee (CPSO#: 70574 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health
Emergency Medicine
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
9058831212 Extn: 7270

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 Queensway W.
Mississauga Ontario L5B1B5
Phone: 905-270-0170
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 26 Peter St N.
Mississauga Ontario L5H 2G7
Phone: 905-278-2213
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lee (CPSO#: 70574 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health
Emergency Medicine
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
9058831212 Extn: 7270

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK KUMHO LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK KUMHO LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996