THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:52:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 749-4300
Extension: x2631
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Hosek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hosek (CPSO#: 70584 )
Business Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300

Corporation Name: Hosek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Nov 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 749-4300
Extension: x2631
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Hosek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hosek (CPSO#: 70584 )
Business Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300

Corporation Name: Hosek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Nov 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL HOSEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL HOSEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1996