THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:50:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Leamington and Area
Family Health Team
197 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 322-1100
Fax: (519) 322-2055
Address: Erie Shores Health Care
194 Talbot St W
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheila Horen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Horen (CPSO#: 70638 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Leamington and Area
Family Health Team
197 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 322-1100
Fax: (519) 322-2055
Address: Erie Shores Health Care
194 Talbot St W
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheila Horen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Horen (CPSO#: 70638 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEILA ALEXANDRA HOREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOREN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEILA ALEXANDRA HOREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOREN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1996