THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:33:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 222 Mapleview Dr W
SUITE 24
Barrie ON L4N 9E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 737 9235
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamaleddin Tumi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tumi (CPSO#: 70642 )
Business Address: 102 - 34 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 737-9235
Business Address: 222 Mapleview Dr W
unit 24
Barrie ON L4N 9E7
705 737 9235

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 222 Mapleview Dr W
SUITE 24
Barrie ON L4N 9E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 737 9235
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamaleddin Tumi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tumi (CPSO#: 70642 )
Business Address: 102 - 34 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 737-9235
Business Address: 222 Mapleview Dr W
unit 24
Barrie ON L4N 9E7
705 737 9235

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAMALEDDIN HUSSEIN TUMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAMALEDDIN HUSSEIN TUMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1996