THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:45:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1976
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17 - 531 Atkinson Ave
Thornhill Ontario L4J 8L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 771-1779
Fax: (905) 771-9833
Address: 10 Royal Orchard Blvd
Thornhill ON L3T 3C3
Phone: 905-881-1661
Fax: 905-881-1710

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records can be requested from Dr. Leah Rose Feldman at Atkinson Medical Centre 17 - 531 Atkinson Avenue, Thornhill ON l4j 8l7
Date Received: 05 Jun 2019

Instructions/Address: The legal custodian of my medical records is Dr. Leah Feldman CPSO #110162. She will be practicing at the same address as I have.
Date Received: 01 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Norman Just Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Katz (CPSO#: 70683 ) Dr. N. Just (CPSO#: 70679 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17 - 531 Atkinson Ave
Thornhill Ontario L4J 8L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 771-1779
Fax: (905) 771-9833
Address: 10 Royal Orchard Blvd
Thornhill ON L3T 3C3
Phone: 905-881-1661
Fax: 905-881-1710

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records can be requested from Dr. Leah Rose Feldman at Atkinson Medical Centre 17 - 531 Atkinson Avenue, Thornhill ON l4j 8l7
Date Received: 05 Jun 2019

Instructions/Address: The legal custodian of my medical records is Dr. Leah Feldman CPSO #110162. She will be practicing at the same address as I have.
Date Received: 01 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Norman Just Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Katz (CPSO#: 70683 ) Dr. N. Just (CPSO#: 70679 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIRLEY KATZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIRLEY KATZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1996
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1996