THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 06:48:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 141 Roe Road
Huntsville Ontario P1H 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053801563
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 28 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gzik and Varieur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Varieur (CPSO#: 70712 ) Dr. D. Gzik (CPSO#: 70710 )
Business Address: Suite 201
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 789-6137

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 141 Roe Road
Huntsville Ontario P1H 0A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053801563
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 28 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gzik and Varieur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Varieur (CPSO#: 70712 ) Dr. D. Gzik (CPSO#: 70710 )
Business Address: Suite 201
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 789-6137

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN PAUL VARIEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARIEUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN PAUL VARIEUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARIEUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1996
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 1996