THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:18:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 86 Kent Street North
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 3S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 426-8800
Fax: (519) 426-5700
Address: West Haldimand General Hospital
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville Ontario N0A 1H0
Phone: (905) 768-3311
Fax: (905) 768-8670
Address: Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519) 426-0750
Fax: (519) 429-6998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aqeel Ibrahim Al-Aqeel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Aqeel (CPSO#: 70733 )
Business Address: 86 Kent Street North
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 3S4
(519) 426-8800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 86 Kent Street North
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 3S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 426-8800
Fax: (519) 426-5700
Address: West Haldimand General Hospital
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville Ontario N0A 1H0
Phone: (905) 768-3311
Fax: (905) 768-8670
Address: Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519) 426-0750
Fax: (519) 429-6998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aqeel Ibrahim Al-Aqeel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Aqeel (CPSO#: 70733 )
Business Address: 86 Kent Street North
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 3S4
(519) 426-8800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AQEEL IBRAHIM MOHAMMED AL-AQEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-AQEEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AQEEL IBRAHIM MOHAMMED AL-AQEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-AQEEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 1996