THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:50:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 12
305 Charolais Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 2R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 456-8099
Fax: (905) 456-1888

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hussain (CPSO#: 70752 )
Business Address: 12 - 305 Charolais Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 2R2
(905) 456-8099

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 12
305 Charolais Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 2R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 456-8099
Fax: (905) 456-1888

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hussain (CPSO#: 70752 )
Business Address: 12 - 305 Charolais Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 2R2
(905) 456-8099

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIAZ HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIAZ HUSSAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1996
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1996