THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:11:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cardiovascular Lab, Kidd 3
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-1329
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 13 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Malik (CPSO#: 70790 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital - Brock 1 Clinic
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Cardiovascular Laboratory - Kidd 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-1329

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cardiovascular Lab, Kidd 3
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-1329
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 13 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 13 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Malik (CPSO#: 70790 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital - Brock 1 Clinic
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Cardiovascular Laboratory - Kidd 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-1329

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL GUNEET MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL GUNEET MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 1996