THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:42:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 357
1720 Howard Avenue East
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-4900
Fax: (519) 258-4901

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abdullah Aboulisayen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aboulisayen (CPSO#: 70791 )
Business Address: 1720 Howard Avenue
Unit 357
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
519-258-4900

Corporation Name: Abdullah Aboulisayen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Nov 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 357
1720 Howard Avenue East
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-4900
Fax: (519) 258-4901

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abdullah Aboulisayen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Aboulisayen (CPSO#: 70791 )
Business Address: 1720 Howard Avenue
Unit 357
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
519-258-4900

Corporation Name: Abdullah Aboulisayen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Nov 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULLAH MOHAMED ABOULISAYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOULISAYEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULLAH MOHAMED ABOULISAYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOULISAYEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 1996