THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:46:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Joseph's University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
73 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 836-9441
Fax: (519) 836-1793

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hamid Nasser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Nasser (CPSO#: 70809 )
Business Address: 202 - 73 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6L9
(519) 836-9441
Business Address: 1901-190 Hespeler Rd
Cambridge ON N1R 8B8
5192218697

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: St. Joseph's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
73 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 836-9441
Fax: (519) 836-1793

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hamid Nasser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Nasser (CPSO#: 70809 )
Business Address: 202 - 73 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6L9
(519) 836-9441
Business Address: 1901-190 Hespeler Rd
Cambridge ON N1R 8B8
5192218697

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMID A NASSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASSER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMID A NASSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASSER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Joseph's University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1996
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 1996