THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:02:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Asyut University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Catharines General Hospital
1200 fourth ave.
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 684-7271
Extension: 45000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emad Nour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Nour (CPSO#: 70837 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Asyut University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Catharines General Hospital
1200 fourth ave.
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 684-7271
Extension: 45000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emad Nour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Nour (CPSO#: 70837 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMAD IBRAHIM NOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMAD IBRAHIM NOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Asyut University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 1996