THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:27:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 313
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 237-8118
Fax: (289) 809-3437

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Dec 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wang-Cheong Mak Medicine Professional Corporarion
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Mak (CPSO#: 70876 )
Business Address: 313-1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
9052378118

Corporation Name: Dr. Wang-Cheong Mak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Aug 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 313
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 237-8118
Fax: (289) 809-3437

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Dec 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 13 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wang-Cheong Mak Medicine Professional Corporarion
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Mak (CPSO#: 70876 )
Business Address: 313-1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
9052378118

Corporation Name: Dr. Wang-Cheong Mak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Aug 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WANG-CHEONG MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WANG-CHEONG MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1996
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 1996