THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:50:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: (unit #2)
181 Green Lane East
East Gwillimbury Ontario L9N 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 868-9243
Fax: (905) 836-1597
Address: 17730 Leslie St
Newmarket Ontario L3Y3E4
Phone: 905-853-0404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yu Lun Huang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Huang (CPSO#: 70901 )
Business Address: Unit 2
181 Green Lane East
East Gwillimbury Ontario L9N 0C9
(905) 868-9243

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: (unit #2)
181 Green Lane East
East Gwillimbury Ontario L9N 0C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 868-9243
Fax: (905) 836-1597
Address: 17730 Leslie St
Newmarket Ontario L3Y3E4
Phone: 905-853-0404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yu Lun Huang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Huang (CPSO#: 70901 )
Business Address: Unit 2
181 Green Lane East
East Gwillimbury Ontario L9N 0C9
(905) 868-9243

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YU LUN HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YU LUN HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Dec 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1996
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 1996