THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:44:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 10
78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 279-0855
Extension: 235
Fax: 647-362-4554
Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-431-8200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 10 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 22 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John M. You Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. You (CPSO#: 70936 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 10
78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 279-0855
Extension: 235
Fax: 647-362-4554
Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-431-8200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 10 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 22 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John M. You Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. You (CPSO#: 70936 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN MYEUNG-SAE YOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN MYEUNG-SAE YOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 1997