THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:37:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Childrens Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Ophthalmology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-2235
Fax: (613) 738-4237
Address: University of Ottawa
Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8575
Fax: (613) 738-4237

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annick V. Fournier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fournier (CPSO#: 70950 )
Business Address: University of Ottawa Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 722-7000
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Ophthalmology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 2235

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Childrens Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Ophthalmology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-2235
Fax: (613) 738-4237
Address: University of Ottawa
Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8575
Fax: (613) 738-4237

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annick V. Fournier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fournier (CPSO#: 70950 )
Business Address: University of Ottawa Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 722-7000
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Ophthalmology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 2235

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNICK VALERIE FOURNIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOURNIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNICK VALERIE FOURNIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOURNIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Mar 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 1997