THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:39:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Kerala, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-1650 Elgin Mills Rd E
ULTIMATE DIAGNOSTICS Inc.
Richmond Hill ON L4S 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-883-8000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 22 Dundas St
Brighton ON K0K 1H0
Phone: 613-394-4868
Fax: 613-392-2608
Address: 4190 Finch Ave E
ULTIMATE DIAGNOSTICS Inc.
Scarborough ON M1S 4T7
Phone: 416-298-3656
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 120-260 Dundas St E
Trenton ON K2V 1M2
Phone: 613-394-4868
Fax: 613-392-2608

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: They can be reached by phone at 1-800-775-0093 or fax 
at 1-888-316-4125 or visit their website at www.recordsregistry.ca
RECORDS MANAGEMENT Ltd
Date Received: 25 Jan 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Varghese Koshy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Koshy (CPSO#: 70968 )
Business Address: 55 Northumberland Blvd
Trenton ON K8V 6L7
Business Address: 64 Ontario Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 6H9
(613) 392-2634
Business Address: 3530 Derry Road East
Suite 103
Mississauga Ontario L4T 4E3
(905) 671-8380
Business Address: 7 Metcalfe Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 6H3
(613) 392-4446
Business Address: 298 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2N 3B1
(416) 223-6500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Kerala, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-1650 Elgin Mills Rd E
ULTIMATE DIAGNOSTICS Inc.
Richmond Hill ON L4S 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-883-8000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 22 Dundas St
Brighton ON K0K 1H0
Phone: 613-394-4868
Fax: 613-392-2608
Address: 4190 Finch Ave E
ULTIMATE DIAGNOSTICS Inc.
Scarborough ON M1S 4T7
Phone: 416-298-3656
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 120-260 Dundas St E
Trenton ON K2V 1M2
Phone: 613-394-4868
Fax: 613-392-2608

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: They can be reached by phone at 1-800-775-0093 or fax 
at 1-888-316-4125 or visit their website at www.recordsregistry.ca
RECORDS MANAGEMENT Ltd
Date Received: 25 Jan 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Varghese Koshy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Koshy (CPSO#: 70968 )
Business Address: 55 Northumberland Blvd
Trenton ON K8V 6L7
Business Address: 64 Ontario Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 6H9
(613) 392-2634
Business Address: 3530 Derry Road East
Suite 103
Mississauga Ontario L4T 4E3
(905) 671-8380
Business Address: 7 Metcalfe Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 6H3
(613) 392-4446
Business Address: 298 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2N 3B1
(416) 223-6500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VARGHESE CHARUVILA KOSHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSHY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VARGHESE CHARUVILA KOSHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSHY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Kerala, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1997
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 1997