THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:49:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2664
Fax: (613) 738-4878

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zucker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zucker (CPSO#: 71048 ) Dr. A. Karwowska (CPSO#: 75771 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2664
Fax: (613) 738-4878

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zucker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zucker (CPSO#: 71048 ) Dr. A. Karwowska (CPSO#: 75771 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC EDWARD ZUCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUCKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC EDWARD ZUCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUCKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 May 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 May 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 1997