THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:46:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: Foreman, Holly Paige (Used Until: 23 Jul 1998)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Essex CommunityHealthCentre
1361 Ouellette Avenue #101
Windsor Ontario N8X 1J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 253-8481
Fax: (519) 253-0891

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Schincariol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Schincariol (CPSO#: 71066 )
Business Address: Suite 101
1361 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1J6
(519) 253-8481

General Information

Former Name: Foreman, Holly Paige (Used Until: 23 Jul 1998)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Essex CommunityHealthCentre
1361 Ouellette Avenue #101
Windsor Ontario N8X 1J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 253-8481
Fax: (519) 253-0891

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Schincariol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Schincariol (CPSO#: 71066 )
Business Address: Suite 101
1361 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1J6
(519) 253-8481

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOLLY PAIGE SCHINCARIOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHINCARIOL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HOLLY PAIGE SCHINCARIOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHINCARIOL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997