THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:58:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Centre for Family Medicine
I H B
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 783-0022
Fax: (519) 783-0032

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Oct 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 05 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Dixon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dixon (CPSO#: 71071 )
Business Address: The Centre for Family Medicine
25 Joseph Street
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4X6
(519) 578-2100
Business Address: 10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 2C5
(519) 783-0022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Centre for Family Medicine
I H B
10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 783-0022
Fax: (519) 783-0032

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Oct 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 05 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Dixon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dixon (CPSO#: 71071 )
Business Address: The Centre for Family Medicine
25 Joseph Street
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4X6
(519) 578-2100
Business Address: 10B Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2G 2C5
(519) 783-0022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER LYNN DIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER LYNN DIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997