THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:47:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Health Centre
3rd floor
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-721-4928
Fax: 905-721-6610
Address: 111 Simcoe Street North
Unit 100
(Oshawa Pain Management Clinic)
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4S4
Phone: 289-316-1645
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 105 1939 Kennedy Road
MyomedicalMD
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2L9
Phone: 416-412-0101
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 16 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ken Fern Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fern (CPSO#: 71072 )
Business Address: 117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 721-4928
Business Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
(905) 721-4928
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 721-4928

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Health Centre
3rd floor
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-721-4928
Fax: 905-721-6610
Address: 111 Simcoe Street North
Unit 100
(Oshawa Pain Management Clinic)
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4S4
Phone: 289-316-1645
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 105 1939 Kennedy Road
MyomedicalMD
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2L9
Phone: 416-412-0101
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 16 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ken Fern Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fern (CPSO#: 71072 )
Business Address: 117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 721-4928
Business Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
(905) 721-4928
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 721-4928

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEN TOM CHIU FERN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEN TOM CHIU FERN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997