THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:56:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences
Victoria Hospital
Room B3 427
800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6G 5G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8599
Fax: (519) 685-8567
Address: Department of Otolaryngology
London Health Sciences Centre
Westminister Campus
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8699
Fax: (519) 685-8567

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Fung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fung (CPSO#: 71074 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences
Victoria Hospital
Room B3 427
800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6G 5G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8599
Fax: (519) 685-8567
Address: Department of Otolaryngology
London Health Sciences Centre
Westminister Campus
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8699
Fax: (519) 685-8567

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Fung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fung (CPSO#: 71074 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997