THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:16:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 875 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-800-267-6522
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shaista Zareef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zareef (CPSO#: 71088 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 875 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-800-267-6522
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shaista Zareef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zareef (CPSO#: 71088 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAISTA KHANAM ZAREEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAREEF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAISTA KHANAM ZAREEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAREEF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997