THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:15:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dawson Heights Medical Clinic
109 - 109 Regina Ave
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 344-0105
Fax: (807) 344-0135

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Probizanski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Probizanski (CPSO#: 71090 )
Business Address: 109-109 Regina Avenue
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5B4
(807) 344-0105

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dawson Heights Medical Clinic
109 - 109 Regina Ave
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 344-0105
Fax: (807) 344-0135

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Probizanski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Probizanski (CPSO#: 71090 )
Business Address: 109-109 Regina Avenue
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5B4
(807) 344-0105

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES PROBIZANSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROBIZANSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES PROBIZANSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROBIZANSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997