THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:51:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 3406
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7288
Fax: (613) 696-7141

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc Ruel Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ruel (CPSO#: 71094 )
Business Address: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
3402 - 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7288

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 3406
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7288
Fax: (613) 696-7141

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc Ruel Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ruel (CPSO#: 71094 )
Business Address: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
3402 - 40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7288

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC ANDRE RUEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC ANDRE RUEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997