THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:06:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AZARI, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17 Sanders Street East
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 235-0333
Fax: 519-235-3337

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamel Alizadeh-Khiavi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Alizadeh-Khiavi (CPSO#: 71104 )
Business Address: 17 Sanders Street East
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S0
(519) 235-0333

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AZARI, FARSI
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17 Sanders Street East
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 235-0333
Fax: 519-235-3337

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamel Alizadeh-Khiavi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Alizadeh-Khiavi (CPSO#: 71104 )
Business Address: 17 Sanders Street East
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S0
(519) 235-0333

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAMEL ALIZADEH-KHIAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIZADEH-KHIAVI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAMEL ALIZADEH-KHIAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIZADEH-KHIAVI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 16 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 16 May 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997