THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:25:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: Thompson, Andrew Charles (Used Until: 28 Nov 2017)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room E1-102
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Andrew Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Thompson (CPSO#: 71115 )
Business Address: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Suite E1 - 102
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6538

General Information

Former Name: Thompson, Andrew Charles (Used Until: 28 Nov 2017)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room E1-102
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Andrew Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Thompson (CPSO#: 71115 )
Business Address: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Suite E1 - 102
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6538

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES ANDREW THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES ANDREW THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997