THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:01:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 270 Charlotte Street
Suite 202
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-743-6760
Fax: 705-743-1113

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 09 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Nie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nie (CPSO#: 71121 )
Business Address: Suite 303
270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2V4
(705) 743-6760
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
(905) 372-6811
Business Address: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
(705) 653-1140

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 270 Charlotte Street
Suite 202
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-743-6760
Fax: 705-743-1113

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 09 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Nie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nie (CPSO#: 71121 )
Business Address: Suite 303
270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2V4
(705) 743-6760
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
(905) 372-6811
Business Address: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
(705) 653-1140

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT GRAHAM NIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT GRAHAM NIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997