THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 19:31:51 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Radiology T0112
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 34984
Fax: (905) 308-7207

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan Rebello Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rebello (CPSO#: 71123 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Hospital
Department of Radiology - T0112
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 521-6009
Business Address: Ancaster X-Ray and Ultrasound
323 Wilson Street East
Ancaster Ontario L9G 4A8
(905) 648-5900
Business Address: Charlton X-Ray and Ultrasound
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y2
(905) 528-1465
Business Address: Hamilton Ultrasound Diagnostic Services
302 - 200 James Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3A9
(905) 522-2220
Business Address: St. Joseph's Centre Ambulatory
2757 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
(905) 573-7777

Corporation Name: DR. REBELLO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Dec 2022

Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Radiology T0112
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 34984
Fax: (905) 308-7207

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan Rebello Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rebello (CPSO#: 71123 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Hospital
Department of Radiology - T0112
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 521-6009
Business Address: Ancaster X-Ray and Ultrasound
323 Wilson Street East
Ancaster Ontario L9G 4A8
(905) 648-5900
Business Address: Charlton X-Ray and Ultrasound
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y2
(905) 528-1465
Business Address: Hamilton Ultrasound Diagnostic Services
302 - 200 James Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3A9
(905) 522-2220
Business Address: St. Joseph's Centre Ambulatory
2757 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8G 5E4
(905) 573-7777

Corporation Name: DR. REBELLO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Dec 2022

Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN PAUL REBELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REBELLO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN PAUL REBELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REBELLO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997