THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:58:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Gynaecologic Oncology
610 University Avenue M 700
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2254
Fax: (416) 946-2288

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Ferguson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ferguson (CPSO#: 71125 )
Business Address: University Health Network
Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Gynaecologic Oncology
M700 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2254

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Gynaecologic Oncology
610 University Avenue M 700
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2254
Fax: (416) 946-2288

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Ferguson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ferguson (CPSO#: 71125 )
Business Address: University Health Network
Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Gynaecologic Oncology
M700 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2254

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH FERGUSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERGUSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH FERGUSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERGUSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997