THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:19:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 438 Iroquois Shore Road
Bldg C, Unit 1-6
Oakville Ontario L5H 0X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 822-2020
Fax: (905) 822-3030
Address: Suite 236
284 Queen St E
Brampton Ontario L6V1C2
Phone: 905-822-2020
Fax: 905-822-3030

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yasser A. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Khan (CPSO#: 71133 )
Business Address: 2A - 800 Southdown Road
Mississauga Ontario L5J 2Y4
(905) 822-2020
Business Address: Suite 236
284 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L5J 2Y4
(905) 822-2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 438 Iroquois Shore Road
Bldg C, Unit 1-6
Oakville Ontario L5H 0X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 822-2020
Fax: (905) 822-3030
Address: Suite 236
284 Queen St E
Brampton Ontario L6V1C2
Phone: 905-822-2020
Fax: 905-822-3030

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yasser A. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Khan (CPSO#: 71133 )
Business Address: 2A - 800 Southdown Road
Mississauga Ontario L5J 2Y4
(905) 822-2020
Business Address: Suite 236
284 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L5J 2Y4
(905) 822-2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASSER ANWAR KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASSER ANWAR KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997