THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:08:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2682 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1K2S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 269-6800
Fax: (416) 269-8317
Address: Unit 5
1030 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3H 6C1
Phone: (416) 440-2800
Fax: (416) 733-3321

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. J. A. Inch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Inch (CPSO#: 71145 )
Business Address: Suite 400
1 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 3A1
(416) 733-3324
Business Address: 2682 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1K 2S3
Business Address: Unit 5
1030 Sheppard Avenue West
North York ON M3H6C1
4167333321

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2682 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1K2S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 269-6800
Fax: (416) 269-8317
Address: Unit 5
1030 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3H 6C1
Phone: (416) 440-2800
Fax: (416) 733-3321

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. J. A. Inch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Inch (CPSO#: 71145 )
Business Address: Suite 400
1 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 3A1
(416) 733-3324
Business Address: 2682 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1K 2S3
Business Address: Unit 5
1030 Sheppard Avenue West
North York ON M3H6C1
4167333321

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMERON JAMES ARTHUR INCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INCH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMERON JAMES ARTHUR INCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. INCH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997