THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:44:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-426-3121
Fax: 289-799-3924

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 27 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheila Kumari Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Singh (CPSO#: 71150 )
Business Address: 1-1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-426-3121
Fax: 289-799-3924

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 27 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheila Kumari Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Singh (CPSO#: 71150 )
Business Address: 1-1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEILA KUMARI SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEILA KUMARI SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997