THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:38:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge Ontario L9P 1S4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anoosh Sharif Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sharif (CPSO#: 71156 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7093

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge Ontario L9P 1S4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital Uxbridge
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital
LOCATION: Uxbridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anoosh Sharif Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sharif (CPSO#: 71156 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7093

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANOOSH SHARIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARIF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANOOSH SHARIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARIF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997