THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:33:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-545 Niagara St
Welland ON L3C 1L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 820 5222
Fax: 289 820 5656
Address: 128 Saint Catharines Street
Smithville Ontario L0R 2A0
Phone: 9059579000
Fax: 9059576000

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record from Dr. Paolo Oliverio may make a written request to:

1-545 Niagara St
Welland ON L3C 1L7

Phone number: (289) 820-5222
Fax number: (289) 820-5656
Date Received: 08 Feb 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paolo Oliverio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Oliverio (CPSO#: 71166 )
Business Address: 1 - 545 Niagara Street
Welland Ontario L3C 1L7
(289) 820-5222

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-545 Niagara St
Welland ON L3C 1L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289 820 5222
Fax: 289 820 5656
Address: 128 Saint Catharines Street
Smithville Ontario L0R 2A0
Phone: 9059579000
Fax: 9059576000

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record from Dr. Paolo Oliverio may make a written request to:

1-545 Niagara St
Welland ON L3C 1L7

Phone number: (289) 820-5222
Fax number: (289) 820-5656
Date Received: 08 Feb 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paolo Oliverio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Oliverio (CPSO#: 71166 )
Business Address: 1 - 545 Niagara Street
Welland Ontario L3C 1L7
(289) 820-5222

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAOLO OLIVERIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVERIO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAOLO OLIVERIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVERIO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997