THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:50:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
4th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 81945
Fax: (613) 738-8261
Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: (613) 721-2598
Address: Suite 120
1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2H9N6
Phone: 613-820-5050
Fax: 613-820-7831

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Jan 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 24 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Malcolm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Malcolm (CPSO#: 71201 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
4-04 - 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
4th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 81945
Fax: (613) 738-8261
Address: Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: (613) 721-2598
Address: Suite 120
1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2H9N6
Phone: 613-820-5050
Fax: 613-820-7831

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Jan 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 24 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Malcolm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Malcolm (CPSO#: 71201 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
4-04 - 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANINE CHARISSE MALCOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALCOLM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANINE CHARISSE MALCOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALCOLM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997