THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:48:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Hematology
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road, Box 704
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 75055
Fax: (613) 737-8861

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David S Allan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Allan (CPSO#: 71203 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Division of Hematology
501 Smyth Road Box 704
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 75055

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Hematology
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road, Box 704
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 75055
Fax: (613) 737-8861

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David S Allan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Allan (CPSO#: 71203 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Division of Hematology
501 Smyth Road Box 704
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 75055

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID SCOTT ALLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID SCOTT ALLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997