THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:48:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Noolardi Medical Centre
Suite 100
10083 Keele Street
Maple Ontario L6A 3Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 832-4644
Fax: (905) 832-7717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul A. Zanette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zanette (CPSO#: 71211 )
Business Address: All-In-One Health Care Clinic
100 - 10083 Keele Street
Maple Ontario L6A 3Y8
(905) 832-4644

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Noolardi Medical Centre
Suite 100
10083 Keele Street
Maple Ontario L6A 3Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 832-4644
Fax: (905) 832-7717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul A. Zanette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Zanette (CPSO#: 71211 )
Business Address: All-In-One Health Care Clinic
100 - 10083 Keele Street
Maple Ontario L6A 3Y8
(905) 832-4644

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL ANTHONY ZANETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZANETTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL ANTHONY ZANETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZANETTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997