THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 03:21:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 9999 Stn Main
285 Brindle Road
CSOR UMS
Petawawa ON K8H 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 687 5511
Extension: 242 3690
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Crouzat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Crouzat (CPSO#: 71214 )
Business Address: BMC CFB Petawawa
Petawawa Ontario K8H 2X3
(613) 687-5511
Business Address: Chalk River Laboratories
Chalk River Ontario K0J 1J0
(613) 584-8811

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 9999 Stn Main
285 Brindle Road
CSOR UMS
Petawawa ON K8H 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 687 5511
Extension: 242 3690
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Crouzat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Crouzat (CPSO#: 71214 )
Business Address: BMC CFB Petawawa
Petawawa Ontario K8H 2X3
(613) 687-5511
Business Address: Chalk River Laboratories
Chalk River Ontario K0J 1J0
(613) 584-8811

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GEORGES CROUZAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROUZAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GEORGES CROUZAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROUZAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997