THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:23:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-5155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Crocco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Crocco (CPSO#: 71225 )
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-5155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Crocco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Crocco (CPSO#: 71225 )
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY GEORGE CROCCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROCCO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY GEORGE CROCCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROCCO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997