THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:16:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 171 Guelph St
Georgetown ON L7G 4A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058774123
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Farragos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Farragos (CPSO#: 80391 ) Dr. K. Bartlett (CPSO#: 71236 )
Business Address: Halton Hills Family Health
Upper Level
171 Guelph Street
Georgetown Ontario L7G 4A1
(905) 877-4123

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 171 Guelph St
Georgetown ON L7G 4A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058774123
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Farragos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Farragos (CPSO#: 80391 ) Dr. K. Bartlett (CPSO#: 71236 )
Business Address: Halton Hills Family Health
Upper Level
171 Guelph Street
Georgetown Ontario L7G 4A1
(905) 877-4123

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTA DANIELLE BARTLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTLETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTA DANIELLE BARTLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTLETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 May 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997